Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/14/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/20/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/20/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/27/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 08/07/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/10/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/02/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/02/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/09/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/09/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/09/1998