Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/27/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 10/09/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/20/1998