Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/10/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/09/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/09/1998