Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/20/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/27/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/10/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/02/1998