Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 08/03/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 08/07/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/07/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 08/07/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 08/07/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/10/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/02/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/02/1998