Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/11/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/14/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/14/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/20/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/27/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 08/03/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/02/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/09/1998