Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/27/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/27/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/03/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 08/07/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/02/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/09/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/09/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/09/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/15/1998