Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/27/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/03/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/03/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 08/07/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/10/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/02/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/02/1998
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 10/02/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/16/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/16/1998