Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 06/11/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/20/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/07/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/09/1998