Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/16/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 06/16/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/16/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 06/16/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 06/16/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/16/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 06/16/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 06/16/1998
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/17/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/17/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/17/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/17/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/17/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/17/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/17/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/19/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/19/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/25/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/25/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/25/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/17/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/17/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/18/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/11/1998