Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/04/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/11/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/11/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/11/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/11/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/11/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/11/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/11/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/13/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/13/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/13/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/13/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/13/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/13/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/13/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/13/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/25/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/25/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/25/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 02/25/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/25/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/25/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/25/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/25/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/25/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 02/25/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/25/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/27/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/27/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/27/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/27/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/27/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/27/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/27/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/04/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/04/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/04/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/04/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/04/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/04/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/06/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/06/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/06/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/12/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/18/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/18/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/20/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/08/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/08/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/14/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/14/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/14/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/14/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/14/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/23/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/23/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/23/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/23/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/23/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/01/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/01/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/06/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/06/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/07/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/07/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/07/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/07/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/07/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/08/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/08/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/08/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/13/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/13/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/13/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/13/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/20/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/20/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/20/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/20/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/20/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/03/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/10/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/15/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/15/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/15/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/15/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/15/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/15/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/15/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/15/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/15/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/17/1997