Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/18/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/18/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/23/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/23/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/23/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/14/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/14/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/16/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/20/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/24/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/24/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/24/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/27/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/29/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/31/1998
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 08/04/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/14/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/14/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/23/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/23/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/02/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/07/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/07/1998