Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 06/17/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/19/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/16/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/16/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/16/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/23/1998