Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/26/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/21/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/21/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/21/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/21/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/21/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/21/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/23/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/23/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/23/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/23/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/23/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/23/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/23/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/23/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/23/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/23/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/23/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/23/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/30/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/08/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/08/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/08/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/08/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/08/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/08/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/14/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/14/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/14/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/14/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/14/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/05/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/05/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/05/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/05/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/05/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/05/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/11/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/11/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/11/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 07/11/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/11/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/11/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/11/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/11/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/11/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/11/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/11/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/11/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/16/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/16/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/09/1997