Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/25/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/14/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/16/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/13/1998