Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/19/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/25/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/25/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/25/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/14/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/14/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/16/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/27/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/27/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/16/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/16/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/16/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/16/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/16/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/16/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/16/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/16/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/23/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/23/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/06/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/06/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/06/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/13/1998