Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 06/19/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/19/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/19/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/23/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/23/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/23/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/23/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/25/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/14/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/14/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/27/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/27/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/02/1998