There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cardiac Arrest Survival Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide for the establishment at the National Heart, Lung, and Blood Institute of a program regarding lifesaving interventions for individuals who experience cardiac arrest, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/23/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/02/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
06/23/1998Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/23/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/23/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/25/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/25/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/14/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/14/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/14/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/15/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/16/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/20/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/24/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/24/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/24/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/24/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/30/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/30/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/30/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/30/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/06/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/06/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/09/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/17/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/23/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/23/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/25/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/25/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/01/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce06/23/1998 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment07/02/1998 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4121. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/23/1998)

Cardiac Arrest Survival Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act with respect to emergency medical services (EMS). Requires programs for emergency medical services and preventive, diagnostic, therapeutic, and rehabilitative approaches to include: (1) development and dissemination of a core content for a model State training program applicable to cardiac arrest for inclusion in EMS educational curricula and training programs that address lifesaving interventions, including cardiopulmonary resuscitation and defibrillation; (2) a limited demonstration project to provide training in such core content; (3) identification of cardiac arrest care providers; (4) identification of equipment and supplies that should be accessible to such providers to permit lifesaving interventions; (5) development of model State and Federal legislation; and (6) coordination of a national database for reporting and collecting information on the incidence of cardiac arrest and related issues.

Prescribes guidelines for the core content of the model State training program.

Declares that the purpose of the model legislation is to ensure: (1) access to EMS through consideration of a requirement for public placement of lifesaving equipment; and (2) good samaritan immunity for cardiac arrest care providers, those involved with the instruction of the training programs, and owners and managers of property where equipment is placed.