Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/23/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/23/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/25/1998
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/25/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/14/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/14/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/14/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/14/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/15/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/16/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/20/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/24/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/24/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/24/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/24/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/30/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/30/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/30/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/30/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/06/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/06/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/09/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/17/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/23/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/23/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/25/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/25/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/01/1998