Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/22/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/31/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 08/05/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 08/06/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/06/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/07/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 08/07/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/07/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 08/07/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/07/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/07/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 08/07/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 08/07/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/15/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/28/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/07/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/07/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 10/09/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/12/1998