Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/25/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/25/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/14/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/17/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/17/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/24/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/10/1998