Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/25/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/25/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/21/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/21/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/22/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/22/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/05/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 08/06/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/07/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/23/1998
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/23/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/01/1998