Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/25/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/15/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/15/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/15/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/15/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/16/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/22/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/29/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/29/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/29/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 08/04/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 08/07/1998