Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/16/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/16/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/16/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 07/16/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 08/06/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 08/06/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 08/06/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/25/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/25/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/25/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/25/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/25/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/25/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/25/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/25/1998
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/25/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/02/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/02/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/02/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/09/1998