Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/17/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/17/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/20/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/22/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 08/05/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/05/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/09/1998