Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/25/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/25/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 06/25/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/25/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/17/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/17/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/17/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/17/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/30/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/30/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/30/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/11/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/11/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/11/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/11/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/11/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/08/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/08/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/08/1998