Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/04/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/04/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/04/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/04/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/04/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/04/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/04/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/04/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/04/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/04/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/04/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/04/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/04/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/04/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/04/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/04/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/04/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/11/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/11/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/11/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/11/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/11/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/11/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/11/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/11/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/11/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/11/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/11/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/11/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/11/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/11/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/11/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/11/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/13/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/13/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/13/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 02/13/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/10/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/10/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/10/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/10/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/10/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/10/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/10/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/10/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/10/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/10/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/10/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/10/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/10/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/10/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/10/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/10/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/10/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/10/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/10/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/20/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/20/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/20/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/08/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/14/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/14/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/07/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/14/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/18/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/18/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/09/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/06/1997