Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/25/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/14/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/14/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/14/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/16/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/24/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/30/1998