There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

State Sovereignty Act of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To restore the division of governmental responsibilities between the national government and the States that was intended by the Framers of the Constitution, by requiring all Federal departments and agencies to comply with former Executive Order 12612.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/14/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
08/26/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/14/1998Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/15/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/15/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/15/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/15/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/15/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/15/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/15/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/16/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/16/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/20/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/23/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/28/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/28/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/30/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/30/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/31/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 08/05/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/05/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/09/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/24/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/14/1998 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution08/26/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4196.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4196. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/14/1998)

State Sovereignty Act of 1998 - Directs the head of each Federal agency to ensure that each agency activity is carried out in accordance with all the provisions of Executive Order 12612 (as in effect of October 26, 1987). Provides that Executive Order 13083, issued May 14,1998, shall have no force or effect.