Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/15/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/15/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/15/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/15/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/15/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/15/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/15/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/15/1998
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/16/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/16/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 07/20/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/20/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/20/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/20/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/23/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/28/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/28/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/30/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/30/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/31/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 08/05/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/05/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/09/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/24/1998