Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/21/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/21/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/24/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/24/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/24/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/29/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/15/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 09/16/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/17/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/17/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/25/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/25/1998