Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/20/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/24/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/29/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/06/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 08/06/1998