Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/14/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/21/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/21/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/22/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/24/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/27/1998
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/28/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/29/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/29/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/29/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/31/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/31/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/31/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/31/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/31/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/31/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/31/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/31/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/31/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/31/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/31/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/31/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/03/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 08/03/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 08/03/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/03/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/03/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 08/04/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 08/04/1998
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 08/06/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/06/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/06/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/06/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 08/06/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/06/1998
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/06/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 08/06/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 08/07/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/09/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/09/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/09/1998
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/14/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/14/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/16/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/16/1998
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/18/1998
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/18/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/18/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/24/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/02/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/02/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/02/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/07/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/07/1998