Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/16/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/16/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/16/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 07/23/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 07/23/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/27/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/31/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/31/1998
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/31/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/24/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/05/1998