Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/24/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/24/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/24/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/24/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/24/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/29/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/29/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/29/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/29/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/29/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/31/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/31/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/31/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/31/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/31/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/31/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/31/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/31/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/31/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/31/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/31/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/31/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/04/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/04/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 08/04/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/04/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/05/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/05/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/05/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 08/05/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 08/05/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 08/06/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/10/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/23/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/23/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/15/1998