There is one summary. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/16/1998)

Y2K Liability and Antitrust Reform Act - Provides that an action resulting from a computer date failure which is brought in Federal or State court shall be deemed to be based solely in contract and shall only allow recovery for consequential business loss and costs of repair or replacement resulting from the failure if the plaintiff has not suffered any personal injury, excluding emotional harm, as a result and the defendant is: (1) a person who is engaged in commerce to design, develop, or manufacture a computer system, program, software, or component, has given specified notice to buyers, has made available at no charge repair or replacement of hardware and software for products sold after December 31, 1994, and has made available to the buyer a repair or replacement for a computer program or software or hardware that was introduced for sale before January 1, 1995; or (2) any other person who has made reasonable efforts to protect its system, program, or software from computer date failure, has conducted reasonable tests to prevent a computer date failure by July 1, 1999, and has notified its customers and the President's Council on the Year 2000 Conversion by August 1, 1999, of efforts to avoid such failure.

(Sec. 3) Makes the antitrust laws inapplicable to conduct engaged in between the enactment date of this Act and December 31, 2001, solely for the purpose of establishing responses designed to mitigate the impact of computer date failure in a computer system, with an exception for conduct that results in a boycott.