Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 07/16/1998
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 07/16/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/20/1998
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/28/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 08/05/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/10/1998