There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Aimee's Law (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

No Second Chances for Murderers, Rapists, or Child Molesters Act of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To penalize States that release individuals convicted of murder, rape, or a dangerous sexual offense involving a child under the age of 14.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/16/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/17/1998Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime
07/23/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/17/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1336-1337)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/1998Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/16/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/16/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 07/16/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/16/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 07/16/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/21/1998
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/21/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/21/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/21/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/23/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/23/1998
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/29/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/04/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/06/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/09/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/09/1998
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/09/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/09/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/09/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/09/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/11/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/11/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 09/11/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/11/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/11/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/16/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/16/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/25/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/16/1998 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime07/23/1998 Referred to
09/17/1998 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4258.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4258. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/16/1998)

No Second Chances for Murderers, Rapists, or Child Molesters Act of 1998 - Expresses the sense of the Congress that any individual convicted of: (1) murder should receive the death penalty or be imprisoned for life without the possibility of parole; and (2) rape or a dangerous sexual offense involving a child under age 14 should be imprisoned for life without the possibility of parole.

Requires the Attorney General to transfer the following amounts from Federal law enforcement assistance funds for a State that convicted a person of a first offense of murder, rape, or a dangerous sexual offense to a State that convicts that person for a subsequent such offense: (1) up to $100,000 for transfer to each victim of the subsequent offense; and (2) the cost of incarceration, prosecution, and apprehension of such person. Sets forth provisions regarding situations where a person has a prior conviction in more than one State.

Requires the United States Sentencing Commission to amend the Federal sentencing guidelines to provide that whoever is guilty of: (1) murder shall be punished by death or by life imprisonment; and (2) rape or a dangerous sexual offense shall be punished by life imprisonment.

Directs the Attorney General to collect and distribute data to the President, Members of Congress, State governments, and officials of localities and penal and other institutions participating in the Uniform Crime Reports program which includes: (1) the number of murders, rapes, and dangerous sexual offenses committed by persons previously convicted of one of these offenses; and (2) the percentage of cases in which a person convicted of murder, rape, or a dangerous sexual offense in one State commits a second offense in another State.