Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 01/09/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 01/09/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/04/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/04/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/04/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/04/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/04/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/04/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/04/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/10/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/10/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/10/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/10/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/10/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/10/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/10/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/13/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/13/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/13/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/25/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/25/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/27/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/27/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/06/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/06/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/13/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/13/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/13/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/08/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/08/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/14/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/14/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/14/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/14/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/14/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/17/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/17/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/01/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/01/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/01/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/01/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/08/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/08/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/08/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/08/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/21/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/21/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/11/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/11/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/11/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/11/1997