Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/20/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 07/20/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/20/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/24/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/24/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/24/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/24/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/24/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/24/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/24/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/24/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/24/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/24/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/24/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/24/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/24/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/24/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/24/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/24/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/24/1998
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/24/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/24/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/24/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/24/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/06/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/06/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 08/06/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 08/06/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/06/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/06/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/06/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/06/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 08/06/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 08/06/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/06/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 08/06/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 08/06/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/06/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 08/06/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 08/06/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/06/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 08/06/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/06/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/06/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 08/06/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/06/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/06/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/06/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/06/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 08/06/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 08/06/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/06/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/06/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 08/06/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 08/06/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/10/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/10/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/10/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/10/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/10/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/10/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/11/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/11/1998