Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/21/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/21/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/23/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/23/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/23/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/23/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/23/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/23/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/23/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/23/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/27/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/27/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/27/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/27/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/27/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/28/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/28/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/28/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/28/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/30/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/30/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 08/03/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 08/03/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/03/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 08/03/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 08/04/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 08/04/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/04/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 08/04/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/10/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/10/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/10/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/10/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/10/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/10/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/11/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/11/1998