Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/06/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 08/06/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/06/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 08/06/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/06/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/06/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/10/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/10/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/10/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/10/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/10/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/10/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/10/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/10/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/16/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/16/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/16/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/24/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/08/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/08/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/08/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/09/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/20/1998