Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/21/1998
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/21/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/21/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 07/21/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/21/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/21/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/22/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/22/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/22/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/23/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/23/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/27/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/29/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/29/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 08/04/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/04/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 08/04/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/04/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 08/04/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/04/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/06/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/06/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/06/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/06/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 08/06/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/06/1998
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/18/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/18/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/01/1998