Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/22/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 07/22/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/22/1998
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/29/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/29/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/29/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/29/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/09/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/09/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/11/1998
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/11/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/11/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/11/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/15/1998