There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Torture Victims Relief Act of 1998

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Torture Victims Relief Act of 1998

Short Titles as Introduced

Torture Victims Relief Act of 1998

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Torture Victims Relief Act of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide a comprehensive program of support for victims of torture.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/30/1998Became Public Law No: 105-320. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/1998Signed by President.
10/20/1998Presented to President.
10/10/1998Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H10447-10450)
10/08/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/14/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/14/1998Committee on Commerce discharged.
09/14/1998Reported (Amended) by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 105-709, Part I.
07/22/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (34)

Date Chamber
10/30/1998Became Public Law No: 105-320. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/1998Signed by President.
10/20/1998HousePresented to President.
10/10/1998-4:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/10/1998-4:06pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H10447-10450)
10/10/1998-3:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/10/1998-3:52pmHouseMr. Gilman moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
10/08/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/08/1998SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/08/1998SenateAmendment SP 3792 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/08/1998SenateS.Amdt.3792 Amendment SP 3792 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/08/1998SenateAmendment SP 3792 proposed by Senator Jeffords for Senator Grams.
10/08/1998SenateS.Amdt.3792 Proposed by Senator Jeffords for Senator Grams. In the nature of a substitute.
10/08/1998SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S12044))
09/15/1998SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/14/1998-2:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/14/1998-2:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/14/1998-2:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/14/1998-2:17pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7661-7664)
09/14/1998-2:17pmHouseMr. Gilman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/14/1998HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 406.
09/14/1998HouseCommittee on Commerce discharged.
09/14/1998HouseHouse Committee on Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 14, 1998.
09/14/1998HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 105-709, Part I.
08/17/1998HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
08/06/1998HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
08/06/1998HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/24/1998HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House International Relations Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights
07/24/1998HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House International Relations Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights
07/24/1998HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
07/22/1998HouseReferred to House Commerce
07/22/1998HouseReferred to House International Relations
07/22/1998HouseReferred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/22/1998HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations07/22/1998 Referred to
08/06/1998 Markup by
09/14/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-709
House International Relations Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights07/24/1998 Referred to
07/24/1998 Markup by
07/24/1998 Reported by
House Commerce07/22/1998 Referred to
09/14/1998 Discharged from
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment08/17/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4309.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4309. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/08/1998)

Torture Victims Relief Act of 1998 - Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to authorize the President to provide assistance in the form of grants to treatment centers and programs in foreign countries that are carrying out projects or activities specifically designed to treat victims of torture for the physical and psychological effects of such torture.

Authorizes appropriations for FY 1999 and 2000.

Authorizes the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to provide grants to U.S. programs to cover the costs of services for: (1) the rehabilitation of victims of torture, including treatment of the physical and psychological effects of torture; (2) social and legal services for victims of torture; and (3) research and training for health care providers outside of treatment centers. Authorizes appropriations for FY 1999 and 2000.

Authorizes appropriations to the United Nations Voluntary Fund for Victims of Torture.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the President should: (1) request the Fund to find new ways to support and protect treatment centers and programs (including the development of new centers and programs) that are carrying out rehabilitative services for victims of torture; (2) use the U.S. vote to support the work of the Special Rapporteur on Torture and the Committee Against Torture established under the Convention Against Torture and Other Cruel, Inhuman or Degrading Treatment or Punishment; and (3) use the U.S. vote to establish a country rapporteur or similar procedural mechanism to investigate human rights violations in a country if either the Special Rapporteur or the Committee Against Torture indicates that a systematic practice of torture is prevalent in such country.

Directs the Secretary of State to provide training for foreign service officers with respect to torture victims, including gender-specific training on the subject of interacting with women and men who are victims of torture by rape or any other form of sexual violence.