There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Schools and Libraries Internet Access Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to reduce telephone rates, provide advanced telecommunications services to schools, libraries, and certain health care facilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/23/1998Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
08/17/1998Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
07/23/1998Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/1998Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/1998Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/1998Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce07/23/1998 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection08/17/1998 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/23/1998 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4324. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/23/1998)

Schools and Libraries Internet Access Act - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to repeal provisions authorizing the Federal Communications Commission to take certain actions to provide access to advanced telecommunications services for schools, health care providers, and libraries.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to reduce the excise tax paid for telephone and other communications services to one percent (currently, three percent) of the total paid for such services beginning with bills rendered on or after January 1, 1999, and before October 1, 2003. Repeals such communications taxation provisions with respect to bills rendered on or after October 1, 2003.

Establishes in the Treasury the Telecommunications Technology Trust Fund and appropriates into such Fund all amounts received pursuant to the above taxation authority after December 31, 1998. Makes such funds available to carry out provisions of the National Telecommunications and Information Administration Organization Act (NTIAO) as added under this Act. Terminates this section on October 1, 2003.

Amends the NTIAO to direct the Secretary of Commerce to award a fiscal year grant to each State having an approved plan for the acquisition of telecommunications and related services for: (1) the provision of health care services by any public or nonprofit health care provider that serves persons residing in a rural area; or (2) elementary and secondary schools and libraries, for educational purposes. Provides for an allocation of State funding based on relative populations. Requires the State plan to take into consideration the relative economic need of the eligible entities, including the number of students living in low-income or sparsely populated areas. Authorizes appropriations from the Fund for FY 1999 through 2003 for such grants and administrative expenses. Authorizes appropriations for FY 2004 and thereafter for such purposes from general Treasury funds.