Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 07/29/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/30/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/04/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/09/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 09/23/1998