Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/30/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/09/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/15/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/15/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/15/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/15/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/15/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/20/1998