Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/29/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/29/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/29/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/30/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/04/1998
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/04/1998
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/09/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/09/1998
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/09/1998
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/09/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/09/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/14/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 09/23/1998
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 09/23/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/23/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/23/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 10/12/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/12/1998