Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/30/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/03/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/10/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/10/1998
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/10/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/10/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/11/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/23/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/01/1998